Global Patent Index - EP 0675237 B1

EP 0675237 B1 2000-05-17 - Reinforced concrete gutter element and gutter

Title (en)

Reinforced concrete gutter element and gutter

Title (de)

Rinnenelement aus Stahlbeton und Abflussrinne

Title (fr)

Elément de caniveau en béton armé et caniveau

Publication

EP 0675237 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95109000 A

Priority

  • EP 95101467 A
  • FR 9401758 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0668408A1] The channel or gutter (18) is made from assembled sections (1) of reinforced concrete, each having axial holes (8,8') to receive a metal rod for joining the sections together. The rod is threaded and equipped with a nut at each end for adjusting and tensioning the channel/gutter segments. The channel or gutter is covered by a sectional grille (2) with curved transverse slots, and is fixed to the channel by screws (13) inserted through holes in metal edge covers (9) and engaging with threaded dowels underneath welded to reinforcing rods. The edge covers can be made from steel which is either galvanized or coated with a polymer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 11/22 (2006.01); E03F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 11/227 (2013.01); E03F 3/046 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES GB LI LU NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0668408 A1 19950823; EP 0668408 B1 19991222; AT 187993 T 20000115; AT 193075 T 20000615; DE 69514014 D1 20000127; DE 69516929 D1 20000621; EP 0675237 A2 19951004; EP 0675237 A3 19970102; EP 0675237 B1 20000517; FR 2716217 A1 19950818; FR 2716217 B1 19960503

INPADOC legal status


2001-09-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. PREFAEST

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-03 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010203

2000-11-15 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-08-18 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000818

2000-08-17 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516929 20000621

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-17 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 668408

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB LI LU NL PT

2000-05-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193075 T 20000615

1999-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990326

1997-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970702

1997-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB LI LU NL PT

1995-10-04 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 668408

1995-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB LI LU NL PT