Global Patent Index - EP 0675243 B1

EP 0675243 B1 2001-12-12 - Fire resistant supporting profile, in particular for a glass-wall and arrangement including the same

Title (en)

Fire resistant supporting profile, in particular for a glass-wall and arrangement including the same

Title (de)

Feuerfestes Tragprofil, z.B. für Glaswand und Anordnung umfassend derselben

Title (fr)

Profilé porteur stable au feu, par exemple pour verrière et agencement comprenant un tel profilé

Publication

EP 0675243 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95400711 A

Priority

  • FR 9403743 A
  • FR 9408023 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0675243A1] The bar comprises a metal element with at least one flange (14) to act as a supporting surface for a panel (40), e.g. of glass, and an inner cavity (2) for drainage and/or fixings. The metal element is contained inside a one-piece bar (5) of a cellulose-based material, such as wood, with a recess shaped to receive it. The inner cavity of the metal element is at least partially filled with an inert substance such as plaster. Both the wooden bar and the inner inert substance are treated to make them fire-resistant.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 3/14; E04C 3/292; E04D 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 3/07 (2006.01); E04C 3/29 (2006.01); E04C 3/292 (2006.01); E04D 3/08 (2006.01); E04D 3/14 (2006.01); E04B 2/74 (2006.01); E04C 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 3/14 (2013.01); E04C 3/07 (2013.01); E04C 3/29 (2013.01); E04C 3/292 (2013.01); E04D 3/08 (2013.01); E04B 2/7412 (2013.01); E04C 2003/0413 (2013.01); E04C 2003/0421 (2013.01); E04C 2003/043 (2013.01); E04C 2003/0434 (2013.01); E04C 2003/0473 (2013.01); E04D 2003/0812 (2013.01); E04D 2003/0825 (2013.01); E04D 2003/0837 (2013.01); E04D 2003/0856 (2013.01); E04D 2003/0893 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0675243 A1 19951004; EP 0675243 B1 20011212; AT 210773 T 20011215; DE 69524464 D1 20020124; FR 2718173 A1 19951006; FR 2718173 B1 19960515

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070330

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080331

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *LAUBEUF

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-04-03 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060403

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-03-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-03-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-06-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-06-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-06-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

2002-03-13 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-03-12 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-03-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69524464 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Free text: 20011212 S.A. *LAUBEUF:5, AVENUE GENERAL DE GAULLE, 94160 SAINT MANDE

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB LI LU NL SE

2001-12-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210773 T 20011215

1997-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970908

1995-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951012

1995-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB LI LU NL SE