EP 0675274 A1 19951004 - Internal combustion engine.
Title (en)
Internal combustion engine.
Title (de)
Brennkraftmaschine.
Title (fr)
Moteur à combustion interne.
Publication
Application
Priority
JP 2017194 A 19940217
Abstract (en)
The present invention relates to an internal combustion engine comprising a cylinder (2,4,5) unit with at least one cylinder bore (2d) defined therein, and an intake passage arrangement (18,34) with a plurality of intake valves (11a,11b,11c) associated therewith for supplying intake air to said cylinder bore, said intake passage arrangement being provided with control valve means (23,32) for controlling the flow of intake air towards said intake valves. The internal combustion engine has been improved in that the control valve means are provided for controlling the flow of intake air towards at least one of the intake valves (11c) separately from the flow of intake air towards at least another one of said intake valves (11a,11b). <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
F01L 1/26 (2006.01); F02B 31/02 (2006.01); F02B 31/08 (2006.01); F02B 75/22 (2006.01); F02D 13/02 (2006.01); F02F 1/42 (2006.01); F02B 1/04 (2006.01); F02F 1/24 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
F02B 31/087 (2013.01 - EP US); F02B 75/22 (2013.01 - EP US); F02F 1/4221 (2013.01 - EP US); F02B 1/04 (2013.01 - EP US); F02B 2275/18 (2013.01 - EP US); F02B 2275/48 (2013.01 - EP US); F02F 2001/245 (2013.01 - EP US); Y02T 10/12 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [XY] DE 4108469 A1 19910919 - MAZDA MOTOR [JP]
- [X] US 5119784 A 19920609 - HASHIMOTO NOBORU [JP], et al
- [Y] US 4570590 A 19860218 - KAWAI TAIYO [JP], et al
- [X] US 4667636 A 19870526 - OISHI KIYOHIKO [JP], et al
- [A] EP 0500123 A1 19920826 - YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]
- [A] DE 3600408 A1 19870716 - AUDI AG [DE]
- [A] EP 0449240 A1 19911002 - MAZDA MOTOR [JP]
- [A] US 4617896 A 19861021 - YOSHIKAWA MASAAKI [JP]
- [A] US 4627400 A 19861209 - TAKATA TOSHIHIKO [JP], et al
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 114 (M - 579) 10 April 1987 (1987-04-10)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 245 (M - 418) 2 October 1985 (1985-10-02)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 181 (M - 492) 25 June 1986 (1986-06-25)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 39 (M - 665) 5 February 1988 (1988-02-05)
- [DA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 326 (M - 441) 21 December 1985 (1985-12-21)
- [DA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 318 (M - 632) 16 October 1987 (1987-10-16)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE FR GB IT
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0675274 A1 19951004; EP 0675274 B1 19980513; DE 69502432 D1 19980618; DE 69502432 T2 19980903; JP 3319645 B2 20020903; JP H07229424 A 19950829; US 6055958 A 20000502
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 95102283 A 19950217; DE 69502432 T 19950217; JP 2017194 A 19940217; US 39142195 A 19950216