Global Patent Index - EP 0675332 B1

EP 0675332 B1 2001-01-10 - Refrigerator with shelves for goods to be cooled

Title (en)

Refrigerator with shelves for goods to be cooled

Title (de)

Kühlschrank mit Kühlgutablagen

Title (fr)

Réfrigérateur à rayons pour des marchandises à réfrigérer

Publication

EP 0675332 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94116964 A

Priority

DE 4410901 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0675332A2] The inside wall (3) of the door (1) features a number of parallel slots (4) with dovetail edges for retention of the hooks (15, 16) on the back of trays (14) holding refrigerated prods. The slots are closed and enlarged at their ends and incorporate grooves (5, 6) along their length, the lower edges (9) of which are interrupted over a length corresp. to that of the hooks for ease of insertion. The hooks are firm enough to prevent the trays from being tipped out. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 23/04; A47B 96/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/06 (2006.01); F25D 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/067 (2013.01); F25D 23/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0675332 A2 19951004; EP 0675332 A3 19961218; EP 0675332 B1 20010110; DE 4410901 A1 19951005; ES 2155078 T3 20010501

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091028

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091027

2011-03-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110301

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091027

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081028

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081024

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081103

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155078 T3

2001-04-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010320

2001-03-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2001-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409634 20010215

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990806

1997-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970429

1996-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1995-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT