Global Patent Index - EP 0675334 B1

EP 0675334 B1 2000-04-12 - Aerodynamic stabilisation and braking device for air-drop body

Title (en)

Aerodynamic stabilisation and braking device for air-drop body

Title (de)

Aerodynamische Stabilisier- und Bremsvorrichtung für Abwurfkörper

Title (fr)

Engin largable à stabilisation et freinage aérodynamique

Publication

EP 0675334 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95400414 A

Priority

FR 9402401 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0675334A1] The missile is equipped with passive stabilisers and is designed to follow an initial trajectory parallel to that of the launch aircraft. It has flexible rear flaps (17) which deploy automatically after launching so that the rate of their deployment varies with the aerodynamic pressure applied to them on release. The forward ends of the flaps are fixed flat to the body of the missile (10), and are reinforced by a series of shorter vanes (20). Otherwise the flaps can be in the form of metal vanes which are pivoted to the rear of the missile and open outwards by the pressure of air against them. Their pivots can be equipped with stops which retract or are broken at a given pressure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 10/16; F42B 10/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 10/16 (2006.01); F42B 10/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 10/16 (2013.01); F42B 10/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2716965 A1 19950908; FR 2716965 B1 19960503; DE 69516200 D1 20000518; DE 69516200 T2 20001123; EP 0675334 A1 19951004; EP 0675334 B1 20000412

INPADOC legal status


2015-03-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-02-27 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69516200

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140211

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140214

- Year of fee payment: 20

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-05-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516200 20000518

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE

2000-04-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000412

1999-08-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MATRA BAE DYNAMICS FRANCE

1997-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971023

1996-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951204

1995-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE