Global Patent Index - EP 0675490 B1

EP 0675490 B1 2000-05-17 - Method for reducing rotational latency in a disc drive

Title (en)

Method for reducing rotational latency in a disc drive

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Verkürzung der Rotationslatenz in einem Plattenantrieb

Title (fr)

Méthode de réduction de la latence de rotation dans un entraînement de disque

Publication

EP 0675490 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95302126 A

Priority

US 21878794 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0675490A1] A method for reducing rotational latency in a system employing a rotating medium (10) includes dividing the medium into discrete angular regions (N=0...N=9), building a seek range array corresponding to the discrete angular regions, searching a command queue array for a command, executing the command and removing the executed command from the command queue array. In this manner, commands within the shortest access time of a current position (Y1) of a data retrieval element (12) are executed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 19/00; G06F 3/06; G11B 19/20; G11B 21/08; G11B 27/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 27/10 (2006.01); G06F 3/06 (2006.01); G11B 19/00 (2006.01); G11B 21/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/0601 (2013.01); G11B 19/00 (2013.01); G11B 21/083 (2013.01); G06F 2003/0692 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0675490 A1 19951004; EP 0675490 B1 20000517; DE 69516932 D1 20000621; DE 69516932 T2 20001005; HK 1013353 A1 20010112; JP H07272457 A 19951020

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2004-03-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040330

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-11-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010328

2000-10-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY LLC

2000-10-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516932 20000621

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-17 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

1999-01-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981126

1996-05-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960325

1995-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT