Global patent index - EP 0675507 B1

EP 0675507 B1 2000-06-14 - Semirigid coaxial cable and its method of manufacture

Title (en)

Semirigid coaxial cable and its method of manufacture

Title (de)

Semirigides Koaxialkabel sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung desselben

Title (fr)

Câble coaxial semi-rigide et méthode de fabrication

Publication

EP 0675507 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95301962 A

Priority

JP 8237694 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0675507A2] The semirigid coaxial cable 5 comprises a center conductor 1, an insulating layer 2, outer conductor 3 and protective covering layer 4 in order. The insulating layer 2 comprises a first insulating layer 2a made of material having a low permittivity and a second insulating layer 2b made of a resin that can be more easily electroless-plated than the material of the first insulating layer 2a. The outer conductor 3 further comprises a electroless-plated anchoring metal layer 3a and electro-plated conductive metal layer 3b. The conductive metal layer 3b further comprises a copper-plated layer 3c, a glossy copper-plated layer 3d, and a strike plated nickel layer or tin-plated layer 3e. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 7/00; H01B 3/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 11/18 (2006.01); H01B 13/016 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 11/1817 (2013.01); H01B 11/1834 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0675507 A2 19951004; EP 0675507 A3 19960918; EP 0675507 B1 20000614; DE 69517462 D1 20000720; DE 69517462 T2 20010308; JP 2929161 B2 19990803; JP H07272553 A 19951020

INPADOC legal status

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080323

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080323

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060120

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070222

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-02-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070226

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-02-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070220

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-01-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69517462

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-20

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19971203

1997-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970121

1996-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1995-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB