Global Patent Index - EP 0675873 A4

EP 0675873 A4 2000-03-29 - SYNTHESIS OF ENCODED POLYMERS

Title (en)

SYNTHESIS OF ENCODED POLYMERS

Title (de)

HERSTELLUNG VON KODIERTEN POLYMEREN

Title (fr)

SYNTHESE DE POLYMERES CODES

Publication

EP 0675873 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 94904077 A

Priority

  • US 9312013 W
  • US 98827892 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9413623A1] Conjugates and methods of producing the conjugates and mixtures thereof are disclosed. Conjugates are comprised of an active polymer made up of monomer units selected from the group consisting of the monomer units of peptides and/or peptoids, and an encoding polymer comprised of encoding monomers wherein the encoding polymer corresponds to the active polymer, and a coupling moiety covalently coupled to the active polymer and the encoding polymer. In accordance with the synthesis methodology, mixtures of large numbers of conjugates are produced by providing a coupling moiety and covalent binding it to an active monomer and an encoding monomer. Additional monomer units are added to the active monomer to create an active polymer and additional monomer units are added to the encoding monomer to produce an encoding polymer until the desired length is reached for the active polymer. Mixtures of conjugates attached to support bases can be used to assay a sample. The sample is brought into contact with the conjugates and a determination is made with respect to which active proteins bind to receptor sites within the sample. When active binding proteins are determined, the encoding polymer associated with the active polymer is sequenced, and by deduction, the sequence of the active polymer is determined.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 237/00; C07H 21/00; C07K 1/00; C07K 5/00; C07K 7/00; C07K 13/00; C07K 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07H 21/02 (2006.01); C07C 237/22 (2006.01); C07H 21/00 (2006.01); C07H 21/04 (2006.01); C07K 1/04 (2006.01); C40B 70/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07H 21/00 (2013.01); C07K 1/04 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00572 (2013.01); C40B 70/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [PX] WO 9306121 A1 19930401 - AFFYMAX TECH NV [NL]
  • [E] WO 9408051 A1 19940414 - UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al
  • [A] R.J. SIMON ET AL.: "Peptoids: A modular approach to drug discovery", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, vol. 89, October 1992 (1992-10-01), WASHINGTON US, pages 9367 - 9371, XP002128602
  • [PX] J.M. KERR ET AL.: "Encoded Combinatorial Peptide Libraries Containing Non-Natural Amino Acids", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 115, 24 March 1993 (1993-03-24), DC US, pages 2529 - 2531, XP002128603
  • [PX] J. NIELSEN ET AL.: "Synthetic Methods for the Implementation of Encoded Combinatorial Chemistry", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 115, 3 November 1993 (1993-11-03), DC US, pages 9812 - 9813, XP002128604
  • See also references of WO 9413623A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9413623 A1 19940623; AU 5827294 A 19940704; CA 2151473 A1 19940623; EP 0675873 A1 19951011; EP 0675873 A4 20000329; JP H08504444 A 19960514

INPADOC legal status


2000-06-28 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20000426

2000-03-29 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000210

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-04-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZUCKERMANN, RONALD N.

1997-04-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KERR, JANICE M.

1995-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950710

1995-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE