Global Patent Index - EP 0676246 B1

EP 0676246 B1 2001-04-11 - MASKING MEMBER

Title (en)

MASKING MEMBER

Title (de)

ABDECKUNGSELEMENT

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE MASQUAGE

Publication

EP 0676246 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93921092 A

Priority

JP 9301398 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0676246A1] It is an object of the present invention to repeatedly use a masking member even in the case of surface treatment requiring heating at high temperature. In order to achieve this purpose, according to the present invention, the masking member is made of engineering plastics having high mechanical strength and high heat resistance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/0462 (2013.01); B05B 15/045 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0676246 A1 19951011; EP 0676246 A4 19960731; EP 0676246 B1 20010411; AU 4834593 A 19950418; AU 675665 B2 19970213; CA 2150362 A1 19950406; CA 2150362 C 20041123; DE 69330140 D1 20010517; DE 69330140 T2 20010823; WO 9509055 A1 19950406

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110929

2012-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110929

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100929

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100531

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081002

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080915

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69330140

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-17

2001-05-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-04-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980217

1996-07-31 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 19960610

1996-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1995-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950526

1995-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB