Global patent index - EP 0676354 B1

EP 0676354 B1 2000-08-16 - Method and device for packing printed products

Title (en)

Method and device for packing printed products

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anordnung zum Verpacken von Druckprodukten

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour emballer des produits imprimés

Publication

EP 0676354 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95810172 A

Priority

CH 104194 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0676354A1] The packaging materials (3) are folded or curved, and are inserted into V-shaped insertion compartments (10). These move in a row continuously along an enclosed transportation track (B). The printed products (4) are inserted into the packaging materials, which are then closed to at least partially enclose the products. The packaged goods (5) are then removed from the compartments. The compartments are moved along a circle. During the packaging process, materials and products are continuously moved with the compartments and in their direction of travel. Materials and products are additionally moved within the compartments, in a direction (A) at right angles to that travel direction. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 39/065

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/10 (2006.01); B65B 25/14 (2006.01); B65H 39/065 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 39/065 (2013.01); B65B 25/14 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4341 (2013.01); B65H 2301/51616 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0676354 A1 19951011; EP 0676354 B1 20000816; AU 1621195 A 19951019; AU 695421 B2 19980813; CA 2145694 A1 19951009; CA 2145694 C 20050524; DE 59508633 D1 20000921; DK 0676354 T3 20001211; FI 112929 B 20040213; FI 951687 A0 19950407; FI 951687 A 19951009; JP 3703876 B2 20051005; JP H07315315 A 19951205; US 5615537 A 19970401

INPADOC legal status

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110317

2012-06-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-03-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59508633

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110316

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110316

2011-11-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-10-31 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2011-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100312

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100419

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100322

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100310

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FERAG AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-12 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-12-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: FREI PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508633

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-21

2000-09-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK GB LI SE

1999-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990121

1996-05-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960311

1995-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK GB LI SE