Global Patent Index - EP 0676591 B1

EP 0676591 B1 2000-09-27 - Household cooking hob, with gas burner having variable positioning

Title (en)

Household cooking hob, with gas burner having variable positioning

Title (de)

Kochmulde mit positionierbarem Gasbrenner

Title (fr)

Plaque de cuisson avec brûleur à gaz à position variable

Publication

EP 0676591 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95105004 A

Priority

IT TO940261 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0676591A2] Domestic cooking hob, of the type comprising a plurality of gas burners (11-16), for the heating of cooking containers, characterized in that at least two of such burners (11,12; 30,31) are arranged on said cooking hob (10) in respective positions as such to allow the joint use for heating a single container of large dimensions, in particular a type of pan used for fish (Fig. 4, parts A,C,D), or the separate use so as to heat one or two containers being of smaller dimensions (Fig. 4, parts B,E). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 3/08; F24C 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/08 (2006.01); F24C 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/085 (2013.01); F24C 15/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0676591 A2 19951011; EP 0676591 A3 19970212; EP 0676591 B1 20000927; DE 69518939 D1 20001102; DE 69518939 T2 20010208; DE 69525079 D1 20020221; DE 69525079 T2 20020620; EP 0995950 A2 20000426; EP 0995950 A3 20000524; EP 0995950 B1 20011121; ES 2151564 T3 20010101; ES 2168834 T3 20020616; IT 1273116 B 19970704; IT TO940261 A1 19951009; IT TO940261 D0 19940408

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140430

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130404

2014-01-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131231

2013-12-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130404

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120425

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120510

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090406

2010-06-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090406

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080506

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080507

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151564 T3

2000-12-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69518939 20001102

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. DINI ROBERTO

1999-06-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MERLONI ELETTRODOMESTICI S.P.A.

1998-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980911

1997-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970731

1997-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1995-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT