Global Patent Index - EP 0676735 B1

EP 0676735 B1 2002-12-04 - Traffic monitoring device

Title (en)

Traffic monitoring device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Verkehrsüberwachung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de surveillance du trafic

Publication

EP 0676735 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95104927 A

Priority

CH 103394 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0676735A1] The road traffic monitoring system can be applied to a crossing having four sets of lights (21, 24), with each road lane housing sensors (25-28). The sensors and lights have interfaces (21a-28a). Inductive loops set into the lanes (29) also indicate the approach of vehicles, and each lane is monitored by radar sensors. The units are bus coupled (33) to a host computer (34) that operates as a management system controlling the process. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/017

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/017 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/0175 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0676735 A1 19951011; EP 0676735 B1 20021204; AT 229212 T 20021215; DE 59510482 D1 20030116; ES 2188623 T3 20030701

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080404

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080403

2009-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080404

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-01-05 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081101

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080403

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070418

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070425

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-06-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070627

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-04-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070425

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-04-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070417

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ROBOT VISUAL SYSTEMS G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2188623 T3

2003-05-16 [ET1] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** REVISION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE PATENT OR THE CLAIMS

2003-04-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030403

2003-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030403

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59510482 20030116

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2002-12-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 229212 T 20021215

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROBOT VISUAL SYSTEMS GMBH

1999-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MULTANOVA AG

1999-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROBERT BOSCH GMBH

1998-09-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980720

1996-05-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960304

1995-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT