Global Patent Index - EP 0676830 B1

EP 0676830 B1 2000-12-20 - Electrical connector housing assembly with improved locking means

Title (en)

Electrical connector housing assembly with improved locking means

Title (de)

Elektrisches Steckergehäuse mit verbesserter Verriegelungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Boîtier de connecteur électrique avec système de verrouillage amélioré

Publication

EP 0676830 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95105028 A

Priority

GB 9407015 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0676830A2] A connector assembly (3) comprises a gear member (8) having a pinion (10) engageable with a rack of a complementary connector (2), and a lever arm (14) for actuating the pinion (10). The connector assembly is further provided with a resilient retention arm (20) for securely and reliably holding the gear member (8) in an open position ready for coupling to the complementary connector. Mating of the connectors automatically releases the gear member (8) by biasing the resilient retention arm (20) out of latching engagement with the complementary connector housing. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/629

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/629 (2006.01); H01R 13/627 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/62944 (2013.01); H01R 12/724 (2013.01); H01R 13/6273 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0676830 A2 19951011; EP 0676830 A3 19980401; EP 0676830 B1 20001220; DE 69519642 D1 20010125; DE 69519642 T2 20010523; GB 9407015 D0 19940601; JP H07282899 A 19951027

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-05 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69519642

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140417

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140429

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060404

2006-04-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060404

2005-03-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050330

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69519642 20010125

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-12-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-12-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-12-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000208

1998-11-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980930

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1995-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE