Global Patent Index - EP 0676834 B1

EP 0676834 B1 2000-07-12 - Accessoires for mechanical and electrical assembling of track lighting systems

Title (en)

Accessoires for mechanical and electrical assembling of track lighting systems

Title (de)

Kupplungsstücke zur mechanischen und elektrischen Verbindung von Stromschienen

Title (fr)

Accessoire d'assemblage mécanique et électrique de rails de luminaires

Publication

EP 0676834 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95200791 A

Priority

FR 9404015 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0676834A1] The accessory is for assembling lighting rails to form L, T or X shapes, the rails being divided into sections that can be assembled tip to tip via interconnection elements. The accessory comprises a support plate (10) with four corner elements assembled on the plate. Each corner element includes a triangular face (13) and two rectangular panels standing up from two of the three edges of the triangle. Together these four elements define a cross-shaped channel on the support plate. Connection elements (15,17) may be fitted into the channels of the fitting, thus defining channels along which cables may be placed. A cover (24) fits over the base support plate (10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 25/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 25/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 25/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0676834 A1 19951011; EP 0676834 B1 20000712; AT 194735 T 20000715; DE 69517847 D1 20000817; DE 69517847 T2 20010222; FR 2718513 A1 19951013

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050329

2003-01-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-11-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020329

2002-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-03-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020329

2002-03-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020329

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010516

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-03-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010330

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-03-26 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010326

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-03-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010326

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-09-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

2000-09-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000815

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69517847 20000817

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2000-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194735 T 20000715

2000-02-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

1998-04-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980213

1996-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960411

1995-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT