Global patent index - EP 0676997 B1

EP 0676997 B1 2000-04-26 - PRE-PACKAGED, PRE-SOAKED CLEANING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MAKING THE SAME

Title (en)

PRE-PACKAGED, PRE-SOAKED CLEANING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MAKING THE SAME

Title (de)

VORVERPACKTES UND VORGETRÄNKTES REINIGUNGSSYSTEM UND METHODE ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE NETTOYAGE PRE-IMPREGNE ET PRE-EMBALLE, ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 0676997 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93925127 A

Priority

US 9310417 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9511584A1] There is disclosed a pre-packaged, pre-soaked cleaning system for use to clean the cylinders of printing machines. The system includes a pre-soaked fabric roll (13) saturated to equilibrium with low volatility organic compound solvent which is wrapped around a cylindrical core (11) having opened ends to form a roll. The saturated, wrapped fabric roll (13) is inserted in a heat-sealable or heat-shrinkable and heat-sealable plastic sleeve (15), the sleeve being in intimate contact with the fabric roll after being subjected to heat-sealing or heat-shrinking and heat-sealing, thus permitting transporting and storage of the system until use without detrimentally affecting the cleaning ability of the fabric roll. The system may also include a slotted canister (23) in which the saturated wrapped roll is inserted before it is placed into the plastic sleeve and heat-sealed or heat-shrunken and heat-sealed thereon, or end caps (25) inserted in the opened ends of the core.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 35/00; B41F 35/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9511584 A1 19950504; DE 69328494 D1 20000531; DE 69328494 T2 20010118; EP 0676997 A1 19951018; EP 0676997 A4 19960207; EP 0676997 B1 20000426; HK 1013972 A1 20010112

INPADOC legal status

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20131028

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20131030

2013-11-20 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20131028

2013-10-30 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69328494

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121025

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121016

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121018

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121029

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-07-30 [REG GB S72] APPLICATION FOR REVOCATION BEFORE THE COMPTROLLER (SECT. 72/PATENTS ACT 1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: S72

2007-09-19 [REG GB 772N] PROCEEDING UNDER SECTION 72 PATENTS ACT 1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: 772N

- Free Format Text: CLAIM LODGED AT THE HIGH COURT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69328494

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-31

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970506

1996-02-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 19951221

1996-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1995-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950502

1995-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT