Global Patent Index - EP 0677014 B2

EP 0677014 B2 2000-12-13 - PACKAGE FOR A SERIES OF PRODUCTS AND ITS METHOD OF PRODUCTION

Title (en)

PACKAGE FOR A SERIES OF PRODUCTS AND ITS METHOD OF PRODUCTION

Title (de)

VERPACKUNG FÜR EINE GRUPPE VON ARTIKELN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

EMBALLAGE POUR UNE SERIE DE PRODUITS, ET SON PROCEDE DE REALISATION

Publication

EP 0677014 B2 (FR)

Application

EP 95900802 A

Priority

  • FR 9401291 W
  • FR 9313277 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9513228A1] Package wherein the elongated stacked products (2) are caused to adhere by one end (2B) to the bottom (4) of the envelope (3). The invention is suitable for packaging prepacked products such as chewing gum strips, dairy products, biscuits, chocolate bars or smart cards.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/52 (2013.01); Y10S 206/80 (2013.01); Y10S 206/813 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

US 2008361 A 19350716 - LINDSEY JOHN F

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU MC PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9513228 A1 19950518; AT 149457 T 19970315; AU 688411 B2 19980312; AU 8147594 A 19950529; CA 2153491 A1 19950518; CA 2153491 C 20020611; DE 69401913 D1 19970410; DE 69401913 T2 19970710; DE 69401913 T3 20010412; DK 0677014 T3 19970915; DK 0677014 T4 20010417; EP 0677014 A1 19951018; EP 0677014 B1 19970305; EP 0677014 B2 20001213; ES 2098999 T3 19970501; ES 2098999 T5 20010316; FR 2712263 A1 19950519; FR 2712263 B1 19960209; US 5632378 A 19970527

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051107

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031213

2003-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-09-03 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-08-29 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-07-14 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2003-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-06-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030601

2003-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *C.M.B. FLEXIBLE

- Effective date: 20021130

2003-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2002-12-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021108

2002-11-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-11-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-11-07 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-11-07 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20011129

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-11-15 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20011115

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-10-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20011031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011030

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-10-23 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20011023

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-10-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011019

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-10-19 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20011019

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-10-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011018

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-10-17 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20011017

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-10-17 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20011017

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-10-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20011016

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-04-17 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

2001-03-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20010214

2001-01-24 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2001-01-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2001-01-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: MAINTIEN DU BREVET DONT L'ETENDUE A ETE MODIFIEE

2000-12-13 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU MC PT

2000-11-02 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20001102

- Year of fee payment: 7

1998-08-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DANISCO FLEXIBLE FRANCE

1998-01-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PECHINEY DRD/PI

- Effective date: 19971202

1997-09-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

1997-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 19970402

1997-05-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: 72422

1997-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2098999 T3

1997-04-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: 0508;02MIFBUGNION S.P.A.

1997-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69401913 19970410

1997-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19970317

1997-03-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

1997-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU MC PT

1997-03-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 149457 T 19970315

1996-05-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960319

1995-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950703

1995-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU MC PT