Global Patent Index - EP 0677362 B1

EP 0677362 B1 2001-12-05 - Method and apparatus for producing a concrete product

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for producing a concrete product

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Betongegenständen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication d'éléments en béton

Publication

EP 0677362 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95850070 A

Priority

FI 941608 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0677362A1] The present invention relates to a method and apparatus for producing a concrete product in an extruder casting machine, continuous-casting machine or similar equipment. The concrete mix is fed in a conventional manner through a space of delineated cross section, where the continuous-section product is given its desired shape. The concrete mix being cast is compacted during the casting process to the end of removing entrapped air and achieving a constant casting quality of the product. According to the invention, at least one of the compaction movements is a direction-controlled reciprocating compaction movement having at least one translational component in the direction of the casting flow of concrete and at least one translational component perpendicular to said at least one first translational component.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 3/20 (2006.01); B28B 1/08 (2006.01); B28B 3/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 3/228 (2013.01); B28B 1/084 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0677362 A1 19951018; EP 0677362 B1 20011205; AT 210009 T 20011215; CN 1048209 C 20000112; CN 1121459 A 19960501; DE 69524279 D1 20020117; DE 69524279 T2 20020814; ES 2168348 T3 20020616; FI 110174 B 20021213; FI 941608 A0 19940407; FI 941608 A 19951008; JP H0834009 A 19960206; MY 118474 A 20041130; NO 302456 B1 19980309; NO 951295 A 19951009; NO 951295 D0 19950404

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150407

2015-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150826

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150405

2015-05-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 210009 T

- Effective date: 20150406

2015-04-29 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150405

2015-04-22 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20150406

2015-04-15 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20150406

2015-04-07 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69524279

2014-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140418

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140418

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140418

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140428

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140424

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140411

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140422

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2168348 T3

2002-06-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-03-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-03-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69524279 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-12-05 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210009 T 20011215

2000-03-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000113

1996-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960415

1995-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE