Global Patent Index - EP 0677456 B1

EP 0677456 B1 2001-05-02 - COATING CONTAINER

Title (en)

COATING CONTAINER

Title (de)

BESCHICHTUNGSBEHÄLTER

Title (fr)

RECEPTACLE A REVETEMENT

Publication

EP 0677456 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94930360 A

Priority

  • JP 9401786 W
  • JP 6317393 U
  • JP 17193894 A
  • JP 19794094 A
  • JP 26208294 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9511839A1] A coating container receives a coating member having a coating portion thereof disposed in a liquid storage chamber of a container body such that the coating portion can go in and out of the liquid storage chamber so as to enable protruding therefrom. The liquid storage chamber is formed from an easily deformable, soft bag body.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/00; A45D 34/04; B05C 17/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 34/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 34/043 (2013.01); A45D 34/046 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9511839 A1 19950504; DE 69427162 D1 20010607; DE 69427162 T2 20010823; EP 0677456 A1 19951018; EP 0677456 A4 19981223; EP 0677456 B1 20010502

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051025

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031025

2004-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2003-10-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031025

2002-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-10-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021023

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-10-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021008

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-04-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2001-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69427162 20010607

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990520

1998-12-23 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19981110

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1995-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950529

1995-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT