Global Patent Index - EP 0677580 B1

EP 0677580 B1 2002-11-06 - Detergent compositions comprising dye transfer inhibitors, and process for making them

Title (en)

Detergent compositions comprising dye transfer inhibitors, and process for making them

Title (de)

Waschmittelzusammensetzungen mit Zusätzen zur Verhinderung der Farbstoffübertragung sowie Verfahren zur deren Herstellung

Title (fr)

Compositions détergentes avec additifs pour empêcher le transfert de colorant et leur procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 0677580 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94302676 A

Priority

EP 94302676 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0677580A1] The present invention provides a free-flowing powder having a bulk density of at least 600 g/l comprising: (a) from 20% to 95% by weight (on anhydrous basis) of a detergent ingredient selected from the group consisting of aluminosilicate, citrate, silica, carbonate, bicarbonate, silicate, sulphate, phosphate, water-soluble polymer and mixtures thereof; and (b) from 5% to 50% by weight of a copolymer of N-vinylpyrrolidone and N-vinylimidazole. A process for making the free-flowing granules is also provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/06; C11D 3/37; C11D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/02 (2006.01); C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 3/10 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/065 (2013.01); C11D 3/0021 (2013.01); C11D 3/046 (2013.01); C11D 3/08 (2013.01); C11D 3/10 (2013.01); C11D 3/128 (2013.01); C11D 3/3776 (2013.01); C11D 3/3792 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

GB 1348212 A 19740313 - PROCTER & GAMBLE

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0677580 A1 19951018; EP 0677580 B1 20021106; AT 227333 T 20021115; CA 2187439 A1 19951026; CA 2187439 C 20010116; CN 1077135 C 20020102; CN 1149885 A 19970514; DE 69431652 D1 20021212; DE 69431652 T2 20030918; DK 0677580 T3 20021125; ES 2183828 T3 20030401; JP H09512051 A 19971202; PT 677580 E 20030331; WO 9528462 A1 19951026

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140415

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140415

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140413

2014-07-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140707

2014-05-07 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20140413

2014-04-15 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69431652

2014-04-14 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69431652

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130417

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130419

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130430

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130326

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120423

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091104

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091101

2010-01-04 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091101

2009-05-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20080411

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080325

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: THE *PROCTER & GAMBLE CY

- Effective date: 20060430

2007-01-10 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-12-29 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20061016

2006-12-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-12-04 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2006-10-16 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061016

2006-05-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060501

2006-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060415

2006-04-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060414

2006-04-14 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060414

2005-06-13 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050613

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-06-03 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20050603

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-04-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050428

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-04-14 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20050414

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-04-04 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050404

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-04-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050404

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-03-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050314

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-03-14 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050314

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-06-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183828 T3

2003-03-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030128

2003-02-04 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020404210

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69431652 20021212

2002-11-27 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-11-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227333 T 20021115

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990223

1996-05-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960321

1995-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE