Global Patent Index - EP 0677602 B1

EP 0677602 B1 2001-05-09 - Method and apparatus to produce a sliver of fibre material

Title (en)

Method and apparatus to produce a sliver of fibre material

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Luntenherstellung aus Fasergut

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour la fabrication d'une mèche de matière fibreuse

Publication

EP 0677602 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95102460 A

Priority

DE 4412845 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0677602A2] To produce slubbing material from a fibre feed, using a card (16) and the like, during the slubbing development the separate slubbings (42, 44, 46, 48) are measured continuously for each running metres. On a deviation of the weight from a nominal value, the cross section of the air passage (50) is varied as a weight correction, leading the air out of the shafts (24, 26, 28, 30) at the flocking stage, at the shaft corresponding to a weight shift in the part-slubbing. Also claimed is an assembly with an air passage (50) in each flocking shaft (24, 26, 28, 30) which is increased or decreased steplessly according to the measured weight of the part-slubbings (42, 44, 46, 48) produced from the flockings (34, 36, 38, 40) in the shafts. Pref. each of the shafts (24, 26, 28, 30) is connected to a monitor (56, 58, 60, 62) located after the card (16), to measure the slubbing weight per running metre. A setting unit (54) for a cover (52) adjusts the working in each shaft according to the monitored readings. The cover (52) has a linear movement, sliding parallel to the sieve forming the air passage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 15/52; D01G 23/02; D01G 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/52 (2006.01); D01G 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/52 (2013.01); D01G 23/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0677602 A2 19951018; EP 0677602 A3 19960403; EP 0677602 B1 20010509; AT 201060 T 20010515; DE 4412845 A1 19951019

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2005-12-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-04-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050414

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-02-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050222

2004-02-20 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040220

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-02-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040217

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-21 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-02-14 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020214

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-08-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509235 20010613

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR NL

2001-05-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201060 T 20010515

1998-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980915

1996-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960916

1996-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR NL

1995-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR NL