Global Patent Index - EP 0677622 B1

EP 0677622 B1 2002-09-18 - Drainage channel installable in a floor

Title (en)

Drainage channel installable in a floor

Title (de)

Rinne zum Verlegen in einem Fussboden

Title (fr)

Caniveau pour la pose dans le sol

Publication

EP 0677622 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95105570 A

Priority

  • DE 9406003 U
  • DE 9411478 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0677622A2] The drainage channel comprises a horizontally projecting strip (30) of an angle profile (29) which has a number of slots (32), with a longitudinal axis parallel to that of the channel. An adjusting screw (34) of a fitting device passes through at least one of the slots. The channel profile is fastened to the screw via at least one nut (36). The angle profile is fastened to the ridge wall (16a), and has an angled section to form the projecting strip. The distances between the slots are shorter than their length. After the channel has been installed, the slots are filled in. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03F 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03F 3/046 (2013.01); E03F 2005/0413 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0677622 A2 19951018; EP 0677622 A3 19970102; EP 0677622 B1 20020918; AT 224487 T 20021015

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 224487 T

- Effective date: 20150412

2015-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-04-13 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59510376

2014-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140428

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140423

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140513

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-11-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2008-01-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BLUECHER GERMANY GMBH

- Free text: BLUECHER GERMANY GMBH#AM HERRLEBUEHL 17#78479 REICHENAU (DE) -TRANSFER TO- BLUECHER GERMANY GMBH#AM HERRLEBUEHL 17#78479 REICHENAU (DE)

2006-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-04-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050412

2004-04-23 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040423

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-05-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: BLUECHER GERMANY GMBH

2003-03-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: BLUECHER GERMANY GMBH

2003-01-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BLUECHER GERMANY GMBH

2002-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HIEBSCH & PEEGE AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59510376 20021024

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI NL

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224487 T 20021015

2000-06-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000510

1997-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970204

1997-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI NL

1996-04-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI NL

1995-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI NL