Global patent index - EP 0677641 B1

EP 0677641 B1 2000-07-12 - Method for optimizing the characteristics of an axial fluid flow in a variable annular space around the string

Title (en)

Method for optimizing the characteristics of an axial fluid flow in a variable annular space around the string

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Optimieren der Charakteristiken einer axialen Flussigkeitströmung um die Stange, in einem variablen ringförmigen Raum

Title (fr)

Méthode pour optimiser les caractéristiques d'une circulation axiale de fluide dans un espace annulaire variable autour de tiges

Publication

EP 0677641 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95400663 A

Priority

FR 9404622 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0677641A1] A method of optimising fluid circulation characteristics in a pref. narrow annular space around a tubular element, e.g. a rod length or string with variable eccentricity caused by deformation, involves creating a flow model taking into account the varying shape of the annular space along the rod length and the actual rheological properties of the fluid, e.g. variation of viscosity with shear, in order to evaluate the velocity field and pressure at any point along the annular space. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 21/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 21/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 21/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0677641 A1 19951018; EP 0677641 B1 20000712; BR 9501571 A 19951114; CA 2147088 A1 19951016; FR 2718790 A1 19951020; FR 2718790 B1 19960531; NO 318446 B1 20050321; NO 951431 A 19951016; NO 951431 D0 19950412; US 5850621 A 19981215

INPADOC legal status

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090324

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090324

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060322

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080326

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070427

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-03-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060322

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-03-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050324

2004-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2003-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030331

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): GB IT NL

2000-02-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990203

1996-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960418

1995-11-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CARTALOS, ULYSSE

1995-11-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HACIISLAMOGLU, MUSTAFA

1995-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): GB IT NL