Global Patent Index - EP 0677659 B1

EP 0677659 B1 2000-11-29 - Driving device of a piston pump for cryogenic fluids

Title (en)

Driving device of a piston pump for cryogenic fluids

Title (de)

Triebwerk einer Kolbenpumpe für cryogene Anwendungen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'entraînement d'une pompe à piston pour des fluides à très basse température

Publication

EP 0677659 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95810209 A

Priority

CH 109494 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0677659A2] The drive mechanism is for a piston pump for cryogenic use and involves a crankshaft (2), a connecting rod (10) with a head (12) and a cross head (22), on which a drive rod (32) engages, which via a coupling (31) is connected with the piston rod (32) of the pump (40). The connecting rod head is formed as a ball head which is pivotably located in the cross head. The connecting rod head has an extension (14) screwable into the shaft (11) of the connecting rod and is fixable by a counter nut (18), so that the connecting rod is adjustable as to length. In the shaft of the connecting rod, a central threaded hole is provided in which the extension formed as a threaded rod is screwed and secured. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 53/14; F04B 15/08; F04B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 15/08 (2006.01); F04B 53/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 15/08 (2013.01); F04B 53/147 (2013.01); F05C 2201/0478 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0677659 A2 19951018; EP 0677659 A3 19961113; EP 0677659 B1 20001129; CH 688919 A5 19980529; DE 59508873 D1 20010104

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150329

2015-04-22 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150329

2015-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-03-31 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59508873

2014-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140624

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140417

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140326

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140311

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-12-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59508873

- Representative's name: KEILITZ & SOELLNER, PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2007-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CRYOMEC AG

- Free text: CRYOMEC AG#BINNINGERSTRASSE 85#CH-4123 ALLSCHWIL (CH) -TRANSFER TO- CRYOMEC AG#BINNINGERSTRASSE 85#CH-4123 ALLSCHWIL (CH)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: CRYOMEC A.G.

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508873 20010104

2000-12-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001204

2000-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO FELDMANN AG

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-11-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001129

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990811

1997-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970423

1996-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

1995-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE