Global Patent Index - EP 0677850 B1

EP 0677850 B1 2001-05-09 - Method and apparatus for programming memory devices

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for programming memory devices

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Programmierung von Speicheranordnungen

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour programmation de dispositifs de mémoire

Publication

EP 0677850 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95301953 A

Priority

US 22775594 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0677850A2] A method for programming an integrated memory circuit and an integrated memory circuit structure for storing information are disclosed. The method of programming includes the steps of providing a program mode for programming the memory cells in accordance with a number of the bits of the input data pattern; and programming the memory cells in accordance with the program mode. The integrated memory circuit includes a program mode determining circuit, and a programming circuit operatively coupled to the program mode determining circuit for programming each of a plurality of block of memory cells according to its respective program mode. The program mode determining circuit comprises a circuit for determining the total number of memory cells that is required to be programmed in each block and a control circuit operatively coupled to the memory cells determining circuit for providing a first program mode control signal, a plurality of second program mode control signals and a third program mode control signal, if the total number of memory cells that are required to be programmed in a block is greater than zero but is less than or equal to a threshold number N, greater than the threshold number N, and equal to zero, respectively. Through the use of the programming method and the integrated memory circuit design, the requirement of additional number or increased current capacities of drain pumps associated with programming the integrated circuit is eliminated which reduces design complexity and minimizes the size of the integrated circuit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11C 16/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11C 17/00 (2006.01); G11C 7/00 (2006.01); G11C 16/02 (2006.01); G11C 16/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11C 16/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0677850 A2 19951018; EP 0677850 A3 19961211; EP 0677850 B1 20010509; AT 201111 T 20010515; DE 69520853 D1 20010613; DE 69520853 T2 20011220; JP 3741744 B2 20060201; JP H0845290 A 19960216; TW 332292 B 19980521; US 5530803 A 19960625

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150618 AND 20150624

2015-03-24 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69520853

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140327

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2011-07-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110617

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090323

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090323

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070323

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080307

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080211

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-10-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2007-10-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-01-08 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-25 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020325

2002-03-23 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020323

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-08-10 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010810

2001-08-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010809

2001-08-09 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010809

2001-08-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010809

2001-07-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

2001-06-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69520853 20010613

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LU NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-05-09 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-05-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-05-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201111 T 20010515

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990716

1997-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970414

1996-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LU NL PT SE

1995-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LU NL PT SE