Global Patent Index - EP 0677981 B1

EP 0677981 B1 2000-07-12 - Ballast for discharge lamps with lamp change detecting means

Title (en)

Ballast for discharge lamps with lamp change detecting means

Title (de)

Vorschaltgerät mit Lampenwechselerkennung für Entladungslampen

Title (fr)

Ballast, avec dispositif de reconnaissance de changement de lampe, pour tubes à décharge

Publication

EP 0677981 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94105853 A

Priority

EP 94105853 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0677981A1] A method of driving ballast devices for gas-discharge lamps in which the ballast device is equipped with an inverter (1) and at least one gas-discharge lamp (La) is arranged in the lamp circuit. In the event of the lamp not starting (firing) the inverter is switched off. In order to improve the procedure by fully accommodating circuits with inductively coupled heating currents, lamp exchange (replacement) is ascertained by briefly switching on the inverter (1) again during the measurement phase and by measuring a current from the inverter in the lamp circuit during the measurement phase. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/282

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/298 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/2985 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0677981 A1 19951018; EP 0677981 B1 20000712; AT 194749 T 20000715; DE 59409443 D1 20000817; US 5550433 A 19960827

INPADOC legal status


2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140414

2014-05-07 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20140414

2014-02-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59409443

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130430

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120415

2013-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121228

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120702

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110430

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110516

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100415

2010-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090416

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090310

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-05 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081101

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: KNOBEL AG LICHTTECHNISCHE KOMPONENTEN

- Free text: KNOBEL AG LICHTTECHNISCHE KOMPONENTEN# #CH-8755 ENNENDA (CH) -TRANSFER TO- KNOBEL AG LICHTTECHNISCHE KOMPONENTEN# #CH-8755 ENNENDA (CH)

2007-04-13 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070413

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MITTLER & C. S.R.L.

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409443 20000817

2000-08-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194749 T 20000715

2000-05-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 05B 41/282 A

1998-08-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980715

1996-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960411

1996-01-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1995-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL