Global Patent Index - EP 0678138 B1

EP 0678138 B1 2000-03-22 - A METHOD OF PRODUCING A MINERAL FIBER-INSULATING WEB AND A PLANT FOR PRODUCING A MINERAL FIBER WEB

Title (en)

A METHOD OF PRODUCING A MINERAL FIBER-INSULATING WEB AND A PLANT FOR PRODUCING A MINERAL FIBER WEB

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MINERALFASERBAHN, UND EINE ANLAGE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MINERALFASERBAHN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION DE PRODUCTION D'UNE BANDE ISOLANTE EN FIBRES MINERALES

Publication

EP 0678138 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94904594 A

Priority

  • DK 9400029 W
  • DK 3793 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9416164A1] A method of producing a mineral fiber-insulating web comprises the steps of firstly producing a first non-woven mineral fiber web defining a longitudinal direction parallel with the mineral fiber web transversal direction parallel with the mineral fiber web. Secondly, the web is moved in the longitudinal direction and cut parallel with the longitudinal direction and perpendicular to the transversal direction so as to produce a plurality of parallel strips. Thirdly, the strips are tilted so as to turn the mineral fibers of each of the strips from the arrangement in the transversal direction to an arrangement perpendicular to the longitudinal direction and the transversal direction. The tilted strips are thereupon adjoined so as to produce a second non-woven web containing mineral fibers arranged perpendicular to the longitudinal and transversal directions. A third non-woven mineral fiber web is produced and adjoined to the second mineral fiber web.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/78

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/4209 (2012.01); D04H 1/4226 (2012.01); D04H 1/58 (2012.01); D04H 1/593 (2012.01); D04H 1/645 (2012.01); D04H 1/70 (2012.01); D04H 1/732 (2012.01); D04H 1/736 (2012.01); D04H 1/74 (2006.01); E04B 1/76 (2006.01); E04B 1/78 (2006.01); E04C 2/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/74 (2013.01); D04H 1/4209 (2013.01); D04H 1/4226 (2013.01); D04H 1/593 (2013.01); D04H 1/645 (2013.01); D04H 1/655 (2013.01); D04H 1/732 (2013.01); D04H 1/736 (2013.01); D04H 13/00 (2013.01); E04B 1/7662 (2013.01); E04B 1/78 (2013.01); E04C 2/16 (2013.01); E04B 2001/7683 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9416164 A1 19940721; AT 191038 T 20000415; AU 5858194 A 19940815; BG 99829 A 19960329; CA 2153670 A1 19940721; CZ 9501794 A3 19960313; DE 69423612 D1 20000427; DE 69423612 T2 20000831; DK 3793 D0 19930114; EP 0678138 A1 19951025; EP 0678138 B1 20000322; HU 218566 B 20001028; HU 9502122 D0 19950928; HU T75856 A 19970528; PL 309887 A1 19951113; RO 112772 B1 19971230

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-07 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-01-19 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: PAROC AB

- Effective date: 20001214

2005-01-12 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050112

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-01-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050106

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-06-30 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: PAROC AB

- Effective date: 20001214

2001-09-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010114

2001-02-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PAROC AB

- Effective date: 20001214

2001-01-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010114

2000-08-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-22 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000622

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69423612 20000427

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

2000-03-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191038 T 20000415

1999-08-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: A METHOD OF PRODUCING A MINERAL FIBER-INSULATING WEB AND A PLANT FOR PRODUCING A MINERAL FIBER WEB

1996-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960902

1995-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950705

1995-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IT SE