Global Patent Index - EP 0678150 B1

EP 0678150 B1 2003-06-04 - IMPROVED ROTARY ROLLER REAMER

Title (en)

IMPROVED ROTARY ROLLER REAMER

Title (de)

VERBESSERTER ROTIERENDER RÄUMER MIT ROLLEN

Title (fr)

ALESEUR AMELIORE A ROULEAUX ROTATIFS

Publication

EP 0678150 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95900553 A

Priority

  • AU 9400691 W
  • AU PM230593 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9513452A1] A rotary roller reamer (10) for a borehole has several rollers (11). Each roller (11) rotates about a fixed spindle (13) held at its ends in wedge blocks (14). The spindle (13) has two central passages (19), one at each end. At one end, passage (19) contains a freely slidable piston (21), which is subject to external pressure via a breather aperture (22). The other end passage (19) is blocked by a pressure plug (27) which, when removed, permits injection of grease through passages which include the bearing surfaces of the roller (11) and spindle (13). External pressure is applied to the grease through piston (21), so that there is little or no pressure differential to otherwise force mud into the bearing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 10/24; E21B 10/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/22 (2006.01); E21B 10/24 (2006.01); E21B 10/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/24 (2013.01); E21B 10/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9513452 A1 19950518; AT 242417 T 20030615; BG 62058 B1 19990129; BG 99845 A 19960430; CA 2154285 A1 19950518; CA 2154285 C 20051011; DE 69432786 D1 20030710; DE 69432786 T2 20040513; EP 0678150 A1 19951025; EP 0678150 A4 19990616; EP 0678150 B1 20030604; HU 218196 B 20000628; HU 9502230 D0 19950928; HU T72293 A 19960429; RU 2105122 C1 19980220

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20141109

2014-12-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 242417 T

- Effective date: 20141110

2014-12-03 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20141109

2014-11-11 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69432786

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131106

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131108

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131106

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20131028

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69432786 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020318

1999-06-16 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19990507

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

1996-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951108

1995-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB