Global Patent Index - EP 0678619 B1

EP 0678619 B1 2000-05-24 - Polymeric menbrane

Title (en)

Polymeric menbrane

Title (de)

Kunststoffbahn

Title (fr)

Lè en matière synthétique

Publication

EP 0678619 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95105813 A

Priority

CH 117794 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0678619A1] A plastic strip (I) is claimed, consisting of (A) plastic and/or glass fibre base material(s) with (B) porous agglomerates of water-repellent thermoplastic powder(s) (II) produced on at least one side by the action of heat, and fixed to (A) by mechanical anchorage and/or adhesive bonding. Also claimed is a process for the prodn. of (I), by: (1) spreading powder (II) onto a moving base material (A) and opt. spreading other powder(s) onto the first powder if required; (2) heating to agglomerate (II); (3) pressing the hot prod. between two rollers so as to form the required pore structure and fix the agglomerated material to (A) as above; and (4) cooling the prod.. The process can be repeated on-line, or off-line after winding on a spool, to coat the other side with (B).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06N 3/04; D06N 5/00; D06N 7/00; E04D 12/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06N 3/00 (2006.01); D06N 3/04 (2006.01); D06N 5/00 (2006.01); D06N 7/00 (2006.01); E04D 12/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06N 5/00 (2013.01); D06N 3/0093 (2013.01); D06N 3/045 (2013.01); E04D 12/002 (2013.01); D06N 2201/082 (2013.01); D06N 2209/123 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24405 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24636 (2013.01); Y10T 428/249958 (2015.04); Y10T 428/249982 (2015.04); Y10T 428/254 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31931 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31938 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0678619 A1 19951025; EP 0678619 B1 20000524; AT 193345 T 20000615; CH 686370 A5 19960315; DE 59508372 D1 20000629; DK 0678619 T3 20001030; ES 2079338 T1 19960116; ES 2079338 T3 20001016; FI 951850 A0 19950419; FI 951850 A 19951020; GR 950300071 T1 19960131; NO 310243 B1 20010611; NO 951474 A 19951020; NO 951474 D0 19950419; US 5981031 A 19991109

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-04-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050421

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050419

2005-04-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050419

2005-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HANS ULRICH SEIFERT SEIFERT & PARTNER

2005-01-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-11-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030421

2004-05-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040528

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-04-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040420

2004-03-09 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040309

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-02-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040224

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-02-11 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-12-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030419

2003-12-01 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2003-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SARNA PATENT- UND LIZENZ-A.G.

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030430

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-04-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030421

2003-04-21 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030421

2003-04-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030419

2003-04-19 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030419

2003-04-16 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030416

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-04-19 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020419

2002-04-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020419

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-04-18 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020418

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-04-09 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20020409

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-04-05 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20020405

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-04-04 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20020404

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-03-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020327

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-22 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20011222

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2079338 T3

2000-09-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO ZINK

2000-08-24 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-08-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-08-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000711

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508372 20000629

2000-06-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19950419;SI PAYMENT 19950419

2000-05-24 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

2000-05-24 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193345 T 20000615

1999-12-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: POLYMERIC MENBRANE

1997-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19961223

1996-01-26 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

1996-01-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2079338 T1

1996-01-02 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

1995-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950930

1995-11-22 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1995-11-15 [IECL] IE: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

1995-11-02 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Representative's name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

1995-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1995-10-25 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 950419;SI PAYMENT 950419