Global Patent Index - EP 0678932 B1

EP 0678932 B1 2001-05-23 - Electrical junction and connection terminal

Title (en)

Electrical junction and connection terminal

Title (de)

Elektrische Anschluss- und Verbindungsklemme

Title (fr)

Borne de raccordement et de connexion électrique

Publication

EP 0678932 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95100519 A

Priority

DE 4413643 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0678932A1] The clamp has relatively spaced termination points (16) for electrical leads and associated contact devices for connecting the inserted leads, with the clamps housing (1) formed in at least 2 parts (2, 3), each providing at least one of the termination points. The housing parts are combined to form a single unit, with at least one termination point (18) of the latter provided with a knife clamp contact device, to allow automatic wiring. The assembled unit has interlocking elements (51), allowing it to be combined with other similar units providing the same, or a different, function. The knife contact termination point is pref provided at the separation plane between the individual parts of the clamp housing. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/48; H01R 4/24; H01R 13/506

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 4/38 (2006.01); H01R 4/48 (2006.01); H01R 4/64 (2006.01); H01R 9/24 (2006.01); H01R 13/514 (2006.01); H01R 13/633 (2006.01); H01R 13/652 (2006.01); H01R 13/506 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/4818 (2013.01); H01R 4/2429 (2013.01); H01R 13/506 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0678932 A1 19951025; EP 0678932 B1 20010523; AT 201535 T 20010615; AU 1652595 A 19951102; AU 670899 B2 19960801; DE 4413643 A1 19951026; DE 4413643 C2 19960328; ES 2156905 T3 20010801; JP 3688338 B2 20050824; JP H07302629 A 19951114; RU 95105890 A 19970310; US 5626488 A 19970506

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110118

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110118

2012-02-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120220

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110117

2011-12-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59509269

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110117

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110117

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110117

2011-09-20 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-08-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110801

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100118

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100114

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100131

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100223

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100127

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100125

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100125

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091223

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: VOSSLOH-SCHWABE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Free text: VOSSLOH-SCHWABE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH#HOHE STEINERT 8#58509 LUEDENSCHEID (DE) -TRANSFER TO- VOSSLOH-SCHWABE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH#HOHE STEINERT 8#58509 LUEDENSCHEID (DE)

2004-02-02 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: VOSSLOH-SCHWABE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2003-12-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: VOSSLOH-SCHWABE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Free text: VOSSLOH SCHWABE GMBH#WASENSTRASSE 25#73660 URBACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- VOSSLOH-SCHWABE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH#HOHE STEINERT 8#58509 LUEDENSCHEID (DE)

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010802

2001-08-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156905 T3

2001-07-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-06-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO FELDMANN AG

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509269 20010628

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201535 T 20010615

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001020

1996-05-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960315

1995-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE