Global Patent Index - EP 0679318 B1

EP 0679318 B1 2001-04-04 - UHF-WAVEBAND RADIO-ANTENNA ASSEMBLY FOR VEHICLES

Title (en)

UHF-WAVEBAND RADIO-ANTENNA ASSEMBLY FOR VEHICLES

Title (de)

FUNKANTENNEN-ANORDNUNG FÜR DEN DEZIMETERWELLENBEREICH AUF EINEM KRAFTFAHRZEUG

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE ANTENNE RADIO POUR LA BANDE D'ONDES DECIMETRIQUES MONTE SUR VEHICULES

Publication

EP 0679318 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95900076 A

Priority

  • DE 9401336 W
  • DE 4339162 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9514354A1] The invention concerns a vehicle-mounted radio-antenna assembly for UHF communications links with land stations. A first antenna element with the character of an electric monopole or dipole with an essentially vertical polarization component is mounted on a first surface, made of essentially homogeneous material, on the vehicle body. Its azimuthal omndirectional properties are considerably affected by the environment formed by the vehicle body. In addition to the first antenna element (3), the assembly includes at least one additional antenna element (8) with monopole or dipole character. Each additional antenna element is mounted either on the first (11) or another (12) surface, and the antenna elements together form an antenna assembly with respect to the antenna-connection point (6). At least one of the antenna elements is directly fed and the other(s) are either directly fed or indirectly fed (passive). The clearance (9) between two adjacent antenna elements is set so that it is smaller than one free-space wavelength.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 1/32; H04Q 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/12 (2006.01); H01Q 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/1271 (2013.01); H01Q 1/3275 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4339162 A1 19950518; EP 0679318 A1 19951102; EP 0679318 B1 20010404; ES 2156202 T3 20010616; WO 9514354 A1 19950526

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-12 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59409715

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131118

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-12-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20051112

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051111

2006-07-25 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-11-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051112

2005-11-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051112

2005-11-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051111

2004-12-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041214

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-11-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041110

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-11-05 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20041105

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010710

2001-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156202 T3

2001-06-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409715 20010510

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-06-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FUBA AUTOMOTIVE GMBH & CO. KG

1998-07-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980515

1998-03-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FUBA AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

1996-06-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FUBA AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

1995-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950727

1995-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE