Global Patent Index - EP 0679595 B1

EP 0679595 B1 2000-08-16 - Support roll for a winding machine

Title (en)

Support roll for a winding machine

Title (de)

Trag- oder Stützwalze für eine Wickelmaschine

Title (fr)

Rouleau de support pour une machine d'enroulage

Publication

EP 0679595 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95103284 A

Priority

DE 4414396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5582361A] In a paper-winding machine a paper web passes at least partially around a support roller rotating about an axis and the web is wound up on a windup roll bearing radially on the support roller. The support roller comprises a rigid tubular core having a substantially cylindrical outer surface and an outer layer of material on the outer surface. The layer of material has a thickness between 5 mm and 12 mm (preferably 6 mm to 8 mm), the material is a low-friction elastomer (preferably a nitrile or polyurethane rubber), and the material has a Shore A hardness of between 65 and 80 (preferably 70 to 74).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/16 (2006.01); B65H 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/16 (2013.01); B65H 27/00 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4148 (2013.01); B65H 2301/414863 (2013.01); B65H 2401/10 (2013.01); B65H 2404/1316 (2013.01); B65H 2404/136 (2013.01); B65H 2404/18 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 8717259 U1 19880526

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 5582361 A 19961210; AT 195489 T 20000915; DE 4414396 A1 19951102; DE 4414396 C2 19970410; DE 4414396 C3 20020207; EP 0679595 A1 19951102; EP 0679595 B1 20000816; ES 2150509 T3 20001201; FI 116375 B 20051115; FI 951964 A0 19950425; FI 951964 A 19951027

INPADOC legal status


2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140308

2015-03-10 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59508634

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140308

2014-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 195489

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20140308

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130313

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120329

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100309

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110404

2011-04-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110418

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100308

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100308

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090325

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090324

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-12 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2150509

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508634

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-21

2000-09-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000825

2000-08-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT

2000-08-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 195489

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1997-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970703

1996-03-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960117

1995-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT