Global patent index - EP 0679778 B1

EP 0679778 B1 2000-07-05 - Connecting element for sealing strips of roofs, gables, dormer windows, chimneys, skylights and the like

Title (en)

Connecting element for sealing strips of roofs, gables, dormer windows, chimneys, skylights and the like

Title (de)

Anschlussprofil für Abdichtleisten von Dächern, Giebeln, Gauben, Kaminen, Lichtbändern etc.

Title (fr)

Elément de raccord pour profilés d'étanchéité de toits, pignons, lucarnes, cheminées, éclairages Zénithaux, etc.

Publication

EP 0679778 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95105883 A

Priority

DE 9407028 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0679778A1] The connecting profile seals by means of two successively arranged sealing strip sections (4,5) which connect to one another. The connecting profile (1) has a first accommodation pocket (2) for receiving the first sealing strip section and (11) and a second accommodation pocket (3) for receiving the second sealing strip section end (15). Each accommodation pocket has a rear wall (6,7) arranged behind the sealing strip section end, a front wall (8,9) arranged in front of the sealing strip section end and a basis wall (10,11) locatable against the thrust (12,13) of the sealing strip section end (14,15). The two accommodation pockets are comparatively rigidly connected with one another. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/158; E04F 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/15 (2006.01); E04D 13/158 (2006.01); E04F 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/1585 (2013.01); E04D 13/15 (2013.01); E04F 19/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

DE 9407028 U1 19940908; EP 0679778 A1 19951102; EP 0679778 B1 20000705

INPADOC legal status

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2006-06-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060623

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-02-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508523

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-10

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR

1997-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970731

1996-05-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960314

1995-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR