Global Patent Index - EP 0679788 B1

EP 0679788 B1 2000-01-26 - Trolley as well as rail and sliding assembly

Title (en)

Trolley as well as rail and sliding assembly

Title (de)

Laufwerk sowie Schiene und Verschiebeeinrichtung

Title (fr)

Chariot ainsi qu'ensemble coulissant et rail

Publication

EP 0679788 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95810208 A

Priority

CH 126294 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0679788A1] The profiled rail (LS1) is positioned between the two limbs of the U-shaped bracket (LW1) one limb of which has a support roller (TR) to run in a profiled groove in the track. The bottom of the U-profile has a guide roller (FR) while the top ends of the U-bracket have additional guide rollers (SR). Alternate designs have symmetrically mounted support wheels and different configurations of guide wheels. The axes of the guide wheels are at right angles to those of the support wheels. The combined effect of the wheels is to accommodate lateral moments and prevent damage to the running gear. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/06; E05D 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/06 (2006.01); E05D 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/08 (2013.01); E05D 15/06 (2013.01); E05D 15/0608 (2013.01); E05D 15/0626 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0679788 A1 19951102; EP 0679788 B1 20000126; DE 59507671 D1 20000302; ES 2141321 T3 20000316

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-10-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080329

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090316

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-05-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070618

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-03-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070329

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-03-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070316

- Year of fee payment: 13

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PETER RUTZ

2000-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2141321 T3

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507671 20000302

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI

2000-01-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

1997-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19961220

1995-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950420

1995-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI