Global Patent Index - EP 0679860 B1

EP 0679860 B1 2000-03-15 - Signalling device, in particular a signal rocket

Title (en)

Signalling device, in particular a signal rocket

Title (de)

Signalmittel, insbesondere Signalrakete

Title (fr)

Dispositif de signalisation, en particulier roquette de signalisation

Publication

EP 0679860 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95106002 A

Priority

DE 9407053 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0679860A2] The signal flare, and especially a parachute flare, is contained within an outer tube body (11) formed in one piece together with the covering cap (49). A nominal fracture point, as a weakened zone, is at the junction of the cap and the body tube. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 4/06; F42B 4/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 4/06 (2006.01); F42B 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 4/06 (2013.01); F42B 7/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 9407053 U1 19940728; EP 0679860 A2 19951102; EP 0679860 A3 19970108; EP 0679860 B1 20000315

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120422

2013-02-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59507978

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120421

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120421

2012-12-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-08-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CHEMRING MARINE GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CHEMRING DEFENCE GERMANY GMBH, 27574 BREMERHAVEN, DE

- Document: DE 59507978

- Effective date: 20120628

2012-08-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59507978

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20120628

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110420

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110412

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507978 20000420

2000-04-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE

2000-03-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

1997-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970221

1997-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970108

1997-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE

1995-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE