Global Patent Index - EP 0680062 B1

EP 0680062 B1 2000-06-14 - Tap changer

Title (en)

Tap changer

Title (de)

Lastwähler

Title (fr)

Sélecteur de charge

Publication

EP 0680062 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95102084 A

Priority

DE 4414951 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0680062A2] The load selector for a tapped transformer has a cylindrical oil vessel. Stationary step contacts (2) are arranged on the inside of the cylinder (11). A switch rod (4) arranged inside the cylinder (1) is rotated by a driver. One or several contact carriers (5) are fastened to the rod (4). These each have a switch contact (4) to switch the fixed step contacts. Each contact carrier (5) is fastened to the switch rod (4) by a two-part clamp ring (9) such that the contact carrier (5) is fixedly connected to part of the clamp ring (9) and both parts of the clamp ring (9) surround the switch rod (4). The two parts of the clamp ring (9) are tightened together by fasteners (11,12) outside the switch rod (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 29/04 (2006.01); H01H 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/0016 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0680062 A2 19951102; EP 0680062 A3 19970326; EP 0680062 B1 20000614; AT 193958 T 20000615; ES 2146673 T3 20000816; JP H0855741 A 19960227

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050216

2005-12-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050213

2005-10-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-02-16 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050216

2005-02-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050216

2005-02-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050215

2005-02-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040227

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-02-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-02-17 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040217

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-02-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040213

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-02-03 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040203

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031115

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146673 T3

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508461 20000720

2000-07-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB SE

2000-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193958 T 20000615

1999-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990216

1997-09-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970703

1997-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB SE

1995-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB SE