Global Patent Index - EP 0680063 B1

EP 0680063 B1 2000-07-05 - Medium voltage electric switch

Title (en)

Medium voltage electric switch

Title (de)

Elektrischer Mittelspannungsschalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur électrique moyenne tension

Publication

EP 0680063 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95410026 A

Priority

FR 9405071 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0680063A1] The switch includes a sealed envelope (E) filled with a dielectric gas and presenting two crossings (22,23) for the input and output terminals (A,B). The terminals are connected to input and output fix contacts. A mobile conductor bridge (P) is controlled by a mechanism (M) which can establish or interrupt the contact between the two terminals. A vacuum flask (5) containing fix and mobile contacts (6,7) is connected between the input terminal and the bridge to extinguish any possible arc. The bridge includes two arms (8,9) articulated to an axle (X) and provided with mobile contacts (3,4) at their extremities. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/12; H01H 33/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 19/02 (2006.01); H01H 33/02 (2006.01); H01H 33/12 (2006.01); H01H 33/666 (2006.01); H01H 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/6661 (2013.01); H01H 33/122 (2013.01); H01H 31/003 (2013.01); H01H 33/128 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0680063 A1 19951102; EP 0680063 B1 20000705; DE 69517740 D1 20000810; DE 69517740 T2 20010215; FR 2719154 A1 19951027; FR 2719154 B1 19960607; JP 3544744 B2 20040721; JP H0850837 A 19960220; US 5644117 A 19970701

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080404

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070405

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070601

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-04-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070410

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-04-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060406

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-01-03 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-09-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: EUROPATENT S.A.S.

2000-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69517740 20000810

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT SE

2000-07-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SA

1999-09-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SA

1999-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990629

1996-06-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960424

1995-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT SE