Global Patent Index - EP 0680594 B1

EP 0680594 B1 2000-09-27 - HEAT EXCHANGER DEVICE AND METHOD OF TRANSFERRING HEAT

Title (en)

HEAT EXCHANGER DEVICE AND METHOD OF TRANSFERRING HEAT

Title (de)

WÄRMETAUSCHER UND WÄRMEÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

DISPOSTIF ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR ET PROCEDE DE TRANSFERT THERMIQUE

Publication

EP 0680594 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94905894 A

Priority

  • SE 9400048 W
  • SE 9300209 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9417355A1] A problem in connection with fluid operated solar collector systems is in a simple and non-expensive way to be able to separate the circulatory system of the solar collector from a fluid based energy storage system without any considerable part of the supplied energy being lost. This problem is solved by a heat exchanger (2, 2a, 2b) according to the invention which is provided between the systems. This includes at least two concentric layers (12-15) of helically wound tubes (12a-15e) in a space that is surrounded by mainly cylindric surfaces (10-11). A method according to the invention for transfer of heat between a first fluid that circulates through a tube system (2, 2a, 2b) and a second fluid that surrounds the tube system consists in that the first fluid is pumped through the tube system containing capillary tubes so that the pressure drop across the tube system is at least 100 times larger than the pressure drop across the tube system in the second fluid which is self-circulating.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 13/00; F28D 1/047

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 7/02 (2006.01); F28F 1/00 (2006.01); F28F 13/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 13/12 (2013.01); F28D 7/024 (2013.01); F28F 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9417355 A1 19940804; AT 196686 T 20001015; AU 5981994 A 19940815; DE 69426016 D1 20001102; DE 69426016 T2 20010222; EP 0680594 A1 19951108; EP 0680594 B1 20000927; SE 9300209 D0 19930123; SE 9300209 L 19940724

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090125

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090124

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090131

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090131

2009-09-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2009-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080115

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080124

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-05-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080124

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-02-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071214

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060125

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-01-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070124

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-01-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070115

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-12-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-12-18 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061218

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2001-02-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-01-24 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010124

2000-12-27 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69426016

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-02

2000-09-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-09-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK IT LI LU NL SE

2000-09-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-09-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-09-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-09-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 196686

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1997-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970131

1995-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950818

1995-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK IT LI LU NL SE