Global Patent Index - EP 0680707 B1

EP 0680707 B1 2000-11-02 - Interdental toothbrush

Title (en)

Interdental toothbrush

Title (de)

Interdentale Zahnbürste

Title (fr)

Brosse à dents interdentale

Publication

EP 0680707 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95500068 A

Priority

ES 9401043 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0680707A2] It comprises a head (1,10) made up by filaments (3,4) laid out in a substantially radial direction on a core or stem (5), and is characterized in that the head (1,10) includes zones made up by filaments (3,4) of different thicknesses. In the case of a head (10) of frustoconical shape the filaments of smaller thicknesswhich form one of the zones (D) of the head are also shorter. The different zones (D,E) of the head (1,10) are of different colour, in order to be distinguished from each other. In the case of a frustoconical head, a hardness substantially uniform in all the zones (D,E) of the head (1,10) is achieved. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 9/02; A46B 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 9/04 (2006.01); A46B 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 9/06 (2013.01); A46B 9/04 (2013.01); A46B 9/045 (2013.01); A46B 2200/108 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0680707 A2 19951108; EP 0680707 A3 19970402; EP 0680707 B1 20001102; EP 0680707 B2 20030910; DE 69519247 D1 20001207; DE 69519247 T2 20010531; DE 69519247 T3 20040819; ES 2079318 A1 19960101; ES 2079318 B1 19960816

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-04 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69519247

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140430

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140509

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-07-15 [REG DE 8570] REINSTATEMENT OF THE FORMER POSITION

2004-07-09 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2003-09-10 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20030910

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT PT SE

2001-08-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BRAUN GMBH

- Effective date: 20010620

2001-03-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-02-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010202

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69519247 20001207

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT PT SE

2000-11-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-04-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000308

1997-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970619

1997-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT PT SE

1995-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT PT SE