Global Patent Index - EP 0680822 B1

EP 0680822 B1 2000-01-19 - Method for making packaging of great length

Title (en)

Method for making packaging of great length

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von langen Verpackungsbehältern

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'emballage long

Publication

EP 0680822 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95560002 A

Priority

  • ES 9400924 A
  • ES 9500627 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0680822A2] A method for making packaging of unlimited length, the corresponding equipment and continuous strip of corrugated cardboard packaging thus obtained. This consists of a method by means of which a longitudinal slit (13) is made along the whole length of a roll or coil of corrugated cardboard (1) enabling it to be folded after separating a portion from the roll of suitable length, and possibly some cuts and cutting lines; the device for producing the slit or groove consists of a pulling item made up, for example, of two adjacent rollers (2,3) in line and the actual slit (13) itself is made by the pressure of rings (9) laid out in a fixed or moveable fashion on a roller (8) aligned with another (7) which is used to support this, with cutter holding rollers when cuts and cutting lines have to be made, as well as the corresponding means for length control between cutting cycles. The continuous packing strip has longitudinal slots, and can have transverse cutting lines and longitudinal cuts in both directions starting from said cutting lines. For application in handling rolls for forming boxes or packing. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 3/00; B31B 1/25; B31B 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31B 1/00 (2013.01); B31B 2201/143 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0680822 A2 19951108; EP 0680822 A3 19960612; EP 0680822 B1 20000119; DE 69514565 D1 20000224; DE 69514565 T2 20000727; PT 680822 E 20000731

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050502

2004-02-27 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2004-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040130

2003-12-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031202

2003-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2002-05-13 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20020513

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-05-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020508

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-05-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020508

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO GLP S.R.L.

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69514565 20000224

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT PT

1997-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970416

1996-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960507

1996-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT PT

1995-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT PT