Global patent index - EP 0681023 B1

EP 0681023 B1 2000-03-01 - Compatible fuel additive concentrates

Title (en)

Compatible fuel additive concentrates

Title (de)

Verträgliche Brennstoffzusatzkonzentrate

Title (fr)

Concentrés additifs pour combustible, compatibles

Publication

EP 0681023 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95303035 A

Priority

GB 9408814 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0681023A1] Effective foam control and enhanced additive compatibility is achieved in additive concentrates and liquid fuels containing overbased alkaline earth metal detergents. This is accomplished by utilizing as the antifoam agent a water-soluble polyether-polysiloxane copolymer having a siloxane backbone with organic polyalkylene oxide pendant groups attached to the siloxane backbone via direct silicon-to-carbon bonds. A number of other types of foam inhibitors have been found incapable of achieving these results.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10L 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/14 (2006.01); C10L 1/16 (2006.01); C10L 1/18 (2006.01); C10L 1/22 (2006.01); C10L 1/24 (2006.01); C10L 1/26 (2006.01); C10L 1/28 (2006.01); C10L 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/143 (2013.01); C10L 1/1608 (2013.01); C10L 1/1616 (2013.01); C10L 1/1641 (2013.01); C10L 1/1691 (2013.01); C10L 1/1814 (2013.01); C10L 1/1824 (2013.01); C10L 1/1828 (2013.01); C10L 1/1832 (2013.01); C10L 1/1835 (2013.01); C10L 1/1857 (2013.01); C10L 1/188 (2013.01); C10L 1/1881 (2013.01); C10L 1/1883 (2013.01); C10L 1/1886 (2013.01); C10L 1/189 (2013.01); C10L 1/19 (2013.01); C10L 1/1905 (2013.01); C10L 1/191 (2013.01); C10L 1/192 (2013.01); C10L 1/195 (2013.01); C10L 1/1963 (2013.01); C10L 1/1966 (2013.01); C10L 1/1973 (2013.01); C10L 1/198 (2013.01); C10L 1/1983 (2013.01); C10L 1/1985 (2013.01); C10L 1/222 (2013.01); C10L 1/2225 (2013.01); C10L 1/2235 (2013.01); C10L 1/224 (2013.01); C10L 1/2283 (2013.01); C10L 1/231 (2013.01); C10L 1/232 (2013.01); C10L 1/2364 (2013.01); C10L 1/238 (2013.01); C10L 1/2383 (2013.01); C10L 1/2387 (2013.01); C10L 1/2412 (2013.01); C10L 1/2437 (2013.01); C10L 1/2456 (2013.01); C10L 1/2475 (2013.01); C10L 1/2481 (2013.01); C10L 1/2493 (2013.01); C10L 1/2608 (2013.01); C10L 1/2683 (2013.01); C10L 1/2691 (2013.01); C10L 1/285 (2013.01); C10L 1/301 (2013.01); C10L 1/303 (2013.01); C10L 1/305 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0681023 A1 19951108; EP 0681023 B1 20000301; DE 69515196 D1 20000406; GB 2289287 A 19951115; GB 9408814 D0 19940622; HK 1002223 A1 20000721

INPADOC legal status

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *AFTON CHEMICAL LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-06-15 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-05-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2006-05-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2005-05-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050517

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050427

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000603

2000-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69515196

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-06

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2000-03-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000301

1998-05-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980326

1996-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960426

1995-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT