Global Patent Index - EP 0681343 B1

EP 0681343 B1 2000-07-12 - Device for ground connection of electrical wires especially into a car body

Title (en)

Device for ground connection of electrical wires especially into a car body

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Massenanschluss von elektrischen Kabeln, insbesondere an einer Kraftfahrzeug-Karosserie

Title (fr)

Système pour le raccordement à la masse de câbles électriques, en particulier à une carrosserie automobile

Publication

EP 0681343 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95106538 A

Priority

DE 4415618 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0681343A2] The device provides an earth connection for several electric cables (60, 60'), particularly for connecting cables in a vehicle to the vehicle chassis. The device has several fixed threaded bolts (11, 12, 13, 14) which are fixedly connected to the earth, e.g. the vehicle bodywork. At least the cable cover (61, 61') of a cable (60, 60') can be connected to a bolt and, to make electric contact, it is pressed against a bounding surface by means of a contact washer (63, 63') screwed on to the bolt. The device includes a stepped base rail (10) of electrically conductive material, which bears several threaded bolts (11-14) and which has a common earth connection (17, 18, 19) for all the bolts. Adjacent bolts (11, 12) sit on two bearing surfaces (21', 23') of the rail (10) which are at different heights (15, 16). The step bearing surfaces (21', 23', 25', 27', 29') serve as locating surfaces for contacting the cables associated with these bolts. The sides (22', 24', 26') of the steps form a stop to limit rotation of the cable. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/34; H01R 4/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/34 (2006.01); H01R 11/32 (2006.01); H01R 4/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 11/32 (2013.01); H01R 4/34 (2013.01); H01R 4/183 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0681343 A2 19951108; EP 0681343 A3 19980513; EP 0681343 B1 20000712; DE 4415618 A1 19951109; DE 4415618 C2 19970213; ES 2147805 T3 20001001

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080312

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070411

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-04-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070426

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050430

2006-04-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060410

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050429

2004-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040429

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-03-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040325

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2147805

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-08-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508552

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-17

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-07-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000712

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990315

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981113

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1995-11-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DELPHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1995-11-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

1995-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT