Global Patent Index - EP 0681346 B1

EP 0681346 B1 2000-11-08 - Electrical connector

Title (en)

Electrical connector

Title (de)

Elektrischer Stecker

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique

Publication

EP 0681346 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95106537 A

Priority

DE 9407458 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0681346A2] The electric plug has double-locking for contact parts. The plug has an outer (2) and an inner (3) housing part. These parts (2, 3) are movable relative to each other, perpendicular to the plugging-in direction (K) of a contact part (6). A contact part (6) is locked to the or with the inner housing part (3) when the housing parts (2, 3) are assembled. When the housing parts (2, 3) are moved towards each other into a locking position, the contact part (6) locks with the outer part (3). To establish the assembly position, the inner housing part (2) is moved in a direction (S) which is oriented perpendicular to the direction (T) for establishing the locking position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/436

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/436 (2006.01); H01R 13/506 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/4362 (2013.01); H01R 13/506 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 9407458 U1 19940714; EP 0681346 A2 19951108; EP 0681346 A3 19981021; EP 0681346 B1 20001108; ES 2151565 T3 20010101

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070429

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080312

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-04-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070426

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050430

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050429

2004-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040429

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-03-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040325

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151565 T3

2000-12-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508830 20001214

2000-12-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001114

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2000-02-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990713

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990713

1999-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990421

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1995-11-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DELPHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

1995-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT