Global Patent Index - EP 0681444 B1

EP 0681444 B1 2000-05-17 - FLOOR-CARE DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR A VACUUM CLEANER WITH BRISTLES PREFERABLY ARRANGED ON THE OUTER EDGE AND POINTING DOWNWARDS

Title (en)

FLOOR-CARE DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR A VACUUM CLEANER WITH BRISTLES PREFERABLY ARRANGED ON THE OUTER EDGE AND POINTING DOWNWARDS

Title (de)

BODENPFLEGEGERÄT, INSBESONDERE STAUBSAUGGERÄT, MIT VORZUGSWEISE AUSSENRANDSEITIG ANGEORDNETEN, NACH UNTEN GERICHTETEN BORSTEN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL POUR L'ENTRETIEN DE SOLS, NOTAMMENT ASPIRATEUR, POURVU DE POILS DE BROSSERIE DISPOSES DE PREFERENCE SUR LE BORD EXTERIEUR ET DIRIGES VERS LE BAS

Publication

EP 0681444 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95902086 A

Priority

  • DE 9318141 U
  • EP 9403898 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5678279A] PCT No. PCT/EP94/03898 Sec. 371 Date Jul. 21, 1995 Sec. 102(e) Date Jul. 21, 1995 PCT Filed Nov. 25, 1994 PCT Pub. No. WO95/14421 PCT Pub. Date Jun. 1, 1995A floor care appliance, in particular a vacuum cleaning appliance, for example a vacuum cleaner (1) or a floor polisher, with downwardly directed bristles (11) arranged preferably around its outer periphery, the bristles (11) being fixed in a mounting strip (13), and the mounting strip (13) being positively held in a downwardly open receiving groove portion (14) of sidewalls (16, 19) inwardly extending projections (17, 24) being disposed on the sidewalls (16, 19). In order to enable force-free installation and removal of the mounting strip fitted with the bristles, the projections (24) of one sidewall (19) are displaceable into a release disposition for the mounting strip (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/06; A47L 5/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 5/28 (2006.01); A47L 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/0673 (2013.01); A47L 9/06 (2013.01); A47L 9/0666 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

US 4720891 A 19880126 - RENNECKER DAVID B [US], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5678279 A 19971021; AT 192910 T 20000615; AU 1107895 A 19950613; CA 2154763 A1 19950601; CN 1116817 A 19960214; CZ 9501544 A3 19960117; DE 4499106 D2 19970313; DE 9318141 U1 19950330; DK 0681444 T3 20001009; EP 0681444 A1 19951115; EP 0681444 B1 20000517; ES 2145896 T3 20000716; FI 953561 A0 19950726; FI 953561 A 19950726; FR 2712795 A1 19950602; FR 2712795 B3 19960119; GR 3034133 T3 20001130; IT 1271100 B 19970526; IT MI940783 U1 19950526; IT MI940783 V0 19941125; IT MI942399 A1 19950526; IT MI942399 D0 19941125; JP H08508666 A 19960917; NO 952733 A 19950710; NO 952733 D0 19950710; PL 175119 B1 19981130; PL 309787 A1 19951113; PT 681444 E 20001130; SK 84895 A3 19951108; WO 9514421 A1 19950601

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071125

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071126

2009-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20071126

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2006-12-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061212

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-12-11 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061211

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-09-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-08-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-08-25 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2004-08-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20040601

2004-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-07-26 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Ref Legal Event Code: LTLA

- Effective date: 20031125

2004-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-07-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20031125

2004-07-12 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2004-06-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2004-06-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040601

2004-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VORWERK & CO. INTERHOLDING G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20031130

2004-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2003-12-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031126

2003-11-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031125

2003-11-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031125

2003-11-25 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031125

2003-11-25 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031125

2002-11-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021128

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-11-07 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021107

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-10-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021016

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-10-16 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021016

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-10-16 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021016

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-10-15 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021015

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-10-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021014

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-10-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021014

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-10-14 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021014

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-10-14 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021014

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-10-14 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021014

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-10-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021011

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-10-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021009

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-10-09 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-07-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2145896

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409363

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-21

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 19950710;SI PAYMENT 19950710

2000-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 192910

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1997-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19961213

1995-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950710

1995-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1995-11-15 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 950710;SI PAYMENT 950710