Global Patent Index - EP 0681630 B1

EP 0681630 B1 2001-04-11 - EXCAVATING TOOTH

Title (en)

EXCAVATING TOOTH

Title (de)

BAGGERZAHN

Title (fr)

DENT D'EXCAVATION

Publication

EP 0681630 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94907947 A

Priority

  • US 9401169 W
  • US 1246793 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9418401A1] An excavating tooth (10) for use on a wide variety of excavating equipment is comprised of a point (12), an adapter (14) and a sandwich lock pin (16). The pin includes a rigid casing (54) and a plurality of independently depressible protrusions (58, 59). One of the protrusions (58) resiliently engages a face (22) defined on the nose of the adapter to tighten the connection of the point on the nose. One other of the protrusions (59) extends into an opening (50) defined by the point to secure the lock pin to the point. With respect to an external locking tooth, the opening (50) defined in the point includes a pair of bosses (155a, 155b) which define a reduced portion of the opening. The reduced portion matingly receives and holds the ends of the rigid casing of the pin. The independent locking of the pin and the mating receipt of the casing in the point opening reduces the likelihood of pin loss due to overloading of the elastomeric material, wearing of the components or jacking forces.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 9/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 9/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 9/2825 (2013.01); E02F 9/2841 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9418401 A1 19940818; AT 200539 T 20010415; AU 2856395 A 19951019; AU 5738098 A 19980604; AU 6131994 A 19940829; AU 678907 B2 19970612; AU 690539 B2 19980430; AU 699365 B2 19981203; BR 9405678 A 19951121; CA 2155012 A1 19940818; CA 2155012 C 19990511; CN 1091200 C 20020918; CN 1129024 A 19960814; DE 69427079 D1 20010517; DE 69427079 T2 20010802; DK 0681630 T3 20010702; EP 0681630 A1 19951115; EP 0681630 A4 19961211; EP 0681630 B1 20010411; ES 2157251 T3 20010816; FI 111746 B 20030915; FI 953667 A0 19950801; FI 953667 A 19950927; GR 3036134 T3 20010928; JP 2721043 B2 19980304; JP H08509276 A 19961001; KR 100253438 B1 20000415; NO 953035 A 19950929; NO 953035 D0 19950801; NZ 262018 A 19961126; PT 681630 E 20010830; ZA 9400702 B 19950802

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140203

2014-09-25 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140925

2014-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140210

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140204

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-04 [REG GR MA] RIGHT EXPIRED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MA

- Ref Document Number: 20010400988

- Country of Ref Document: GR

- Effective date: 20140203

2014-04-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2014-03-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK07

- Ref Document Number: 200539

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20140202

2014-02-28 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: *ESCO CORP.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BE20

- Effective date: 20140202

2014-02-26 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20140201

2014-02-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2014-02-12 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: V4

- Effective date: 20140202

2014-02-10 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: MAXIMUM VALIDITY LIMIT REACHED

- Effective date: 20140202

2014-02-04 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69427079

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-02-03 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUP

- Effective date: 20140202

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130122

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-06-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130226

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130224

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130225

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130311

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130226

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130225

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-18 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENSES

- Ref Legal Event Code: CL

- Name of requester: ESCO, FR

- Effective date: 20121214

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120224

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2157251

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-07-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2001-06-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO GLP S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69427079

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-17

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-04-12 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO JEAN HUNZIKER

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 200539

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1998-09-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980813

1996-12-11 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 19961022

1996-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

1995-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950823

1995-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE