Global Patent Index - EP 0681672 B2

EP 0681672 B2 2000-09-20 - PROCESS FOR CONVEYING THICK MATTER CONTAINING PRESHREDDED SCRAP METAL OR SIMILAR SOLIDS

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR CONVEYING THICK MATTER CONTAINING PRESHREDDED SCRAP METAL OR SIMILAR SOLIDS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM FÖRDERN VON VORZERKLEINERTEN METALLSCHROTT ODER DERGLEICHEN FESTKÖRPER ENTHALTENDEN DICKSTOFFEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'ACHEMINER DES MATIERES CONSISTANTES CONTENANT DES DECHETS METALLIQUES PREBROYES OU DES SOLIDES ANALOGUES

Publication

EP 0681672 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 94902701 A

Priority

  • DE 4302799 A
  • EP 9303438 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4341607A1] The plunger (4) delivers the viscous material from a loading chamber (6) fitting closely round it into a transporting cylinder (8). Any solid particles protruding through the cylinder inlet are sheared off by the forward end of the plunger as it passes into the cylinder. There can be a cutting edge round the forward end of the plunger, and the solid particles can be mixed with viscous material or liquid.A rotary movement can be superimposed on the sliding movement of the plunger. Where a predetermined pressure of the medium driving the plunger is exceeded, the latter can be retracted and then thrust forward again.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23G 5/44; F04B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 9/105 (2006.01); F04B 7/02 (2006.01); F04B 9/103 (2006.01); F04B 9/113 (2006.01); F04B 15/02 (2006.01); F04B 53/08 (2006.01); F04B 53/14 (2006.01); F04B 53/16 (2006.01); F23G 5/033 (2006.01); F23G 5/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 9/1035 (2013.01); F04B 7/0266 (2013.01); F04B 15/023 (2013.01); F04B 53/08 (2013.01); F04B 53/14 (2013.01); F04B 53/164 (2013.01); F23G 5/444 (2013.01); F23G 2203/20 (2013.01); F23G 2205/10 (2013.01); Y10T 83/04 (2015.04); Y10T 83/0429 (2015.04); Y10T 83/0448 (2015.04); Y10T 83/0524 (2015.04); Y10T 83/141 (2015.04); Y10T 83/263 (2015.04); Y10T 83/4815 (2015.04); Y10T 83/538 (2015.04); Y10T 83/727 (2015.04); Y10T 83/8858 (2015.04); Y10T 83/9428 (2015.04); Y10T 409/306776 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

  • Prof. Dr.-Ing. Backe, W.: GRUNDLAGEN DER ÖLHYDRAULIK, Institut für hydraulische und pneumatische Antriebe und Steuerungen der RWTH Aachen, 3. Aufl. 1978, S. 156-159
  • Ebertshäuser, H.: Der Hydraulik Trainer, Band 5: FLUIDTECHNIK VON A BIS Z, Vereinigte Fachverlage Mainz, 1. Auflage 1989, s. 338-339
  • Katalog der Fa. AB Stafsjö Bruk, Kolmaarden, Schweden, Ausgabe 1992-05 (Auszug)
  • Prospekt der Fa. AB Stafsjö Bruk, Kolmaarden, Schweden, Gerätebeschreibung des Schiebers "PN 16 MV 250 SB 2-1602"
  • Prospekt der Fa. GHELFI AG, Uster, Schweiz: NEUE STUFENLOS REGULIERBARE DICKSTOFFPUMPE TYP MC-150

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 4341607 A1 19940804; AT 150536 T 19970415; CA 2154875 A1 19940818; DE 59305912 D1 19970424; EP 0681672 A1 19951115; EP 0681672 B1 19970319; EP 0681672 B2 20000920; JP 3462876 B2 20031105; JP H08507841 A 19960820; US 5988028 A 19991123; US 6158313 A 20001212; WO 9418501 A1 19940818

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130102

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121207

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-10-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59305912

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-09-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130830

2013-08-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121207

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20111223

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120105

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-11-19 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-09-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100819 AND 20100825

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090701

2008-12-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-12-26 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2008-08-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: PUTZMEISTER CONCRETE PUMPS GMBH

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20071127

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2001-01-17 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001227

2001-01-02 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: PUTZMEISTER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-11-24 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2000-11-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2000-09-20 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL PT

1999-08-11 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SCHWING GMBH

- Effective date: 19971216

1998-08-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

1998-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: PUTZMEISTER-WERK MASCHINENFABRIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 19971231

1998-05-06 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SCHWING GMBH

1998-02-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SCHWING GMBH

- Effective date: 19971216

1997-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19971231

1997-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19971231

1997-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19971231

1997-12-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19971207

1997-09-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: PUTZMEISTER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1997-07-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PUTZMEISTER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1997-06-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Effective date: 19970619

1997-05-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1997-05-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19970421

1997-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59305912 19970424

1997-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

1997-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL PT

1997-03-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Effective date: 19970319

1997-03-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 150536 T 19970415

1996-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19951206

1995-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950612

1995-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL PT