Global Patent Index - EP 0682156 B1

EP 0682156 B1 2000-03-01 - Container

Title (en)

Container

Title (de)

Container

Title (fr)

Conteneur

Publication

EP 0682156 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95106794 A

Priority

  • DE 4416156 A
  • DE 4429927 A
  • DE 9420138 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0682156A1] The cabin has a main box element (2) and at least one extra box element (3,4) opening onto the main cabin. A lift unit (44,45) is provided so that during or after the relevant extra box unit is removed, it can be lowered so that the base walls (10,17) of main and extra box elements are at the same height. Before or during inserting the extra box element into the main cabin, the lift can raise it so that it can be moved into same. Two extra box units can be provided which can be extended on opposite sides of the main cabin and therefore two lifts may be required. Extending guide tracks can be provided for each extra box element which has rollers for running on same. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/343

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/343 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/34305 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0682156 A1 19951115; EP 0682156 B1 20000301; EP 0682156 B2 20040421; US 5732839 A 19980331

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130505

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131201

2014-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130505

2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59507860

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130505

2013-12-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131201

2013-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: M. *SCHALL G.M.B.H. + CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20130531

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120521

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120502

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120529

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120428

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-01-21 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2004-07-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-07-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2004-06-02 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2004-04-21 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: CARMAR SRL

2001-04-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ZEPPELIN MOBILE SYSTEME GMBH

2001-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: CARMAR SRL

2001-02-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CARMAR SRL

- Effective date: 20001128

2001-02-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ZEPPELIN MOBILE SYSTEME GMBH

- Effective date: 20001201

2001-01-24 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CARMAR SRL

- Effective date: 20001128

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507860 20000406

2000-04-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

1996-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19951228

1995-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950804

1995-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL