Global Patent Index - EP 0682209 B1

EP 0682209 B1 2000-03-01 - Light unit comprising hanging devices for unhooking the grille

Title (en)

Light unit comprising hanging devices for unhooking the grille

Title (de)

Leuchte mit Abhängevorrichtungen zum Abhängen eines Rasters

Title (fr)

Luminaire avec des dispositifs de suspension permettant le décrochage de l'écran

Publication

EP 0682209 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95104623 A

Priority

DE 9407941 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0682209A2] The lamp has the raster secured by attachment devices, each having an anchoring part (8) secured to the lamp housing, with an opening receiving a carrier (5), coupled to a holding element for the reflector of the light raster. The carrier is displaced between an upper position in which it is secured to the anchoring part and a lower position in which the raster is removable. Each holding element has a bearing hole in which the bottom end of the carrier is located, for pivoting about a horizontal axis, with a spring blade extending in the insertion direction of the carrier, secured to the anchoring part at its bottom end. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/164 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0682209 A2 19951115; EP 0682209 A3 19960403; EP 0682209 B1 20000301; AT 190125 T 20000315; PL 176459 B1 19990531; PL 308255 A1 19951127

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2002-04-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020404

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: THORN LICHT G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-08-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-07-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507861 20000406

2000-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-03-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

2000-03-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190125 T 20000315

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990723

1996-07-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960508

1996-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1995-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE