Global patent index - EP 0682305 B1

EP 0682305 B1 2000-08-02 - Circuit device for generating a reference current

Title (en)

Circuit device for generating a reference current

Title (de)

Schaltungsanordnung zur Erzeugung eines Referenzstroms

Title (fr)

Circuit pour la génération d'un courant de référence

Publication

EP 0682305 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95106997 A

Priority

DE 4416711 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4416711C1] The circuit applies a reference voltage (1) to the base of an 'NPN' transistor (8) and the emitter is ground coupled. The transistor connects with other 'PNP' transistors (4,6,9), with a connection to a voltage supply (2) that also connects with a series of 'PNP' transistors (12,14,16,18,20,22) via resistors (11,13,15,17,19,21). An external resistor (26) is used to adjust the reference current generated (25) to the required value.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05F 3/22; G05F 3/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05F 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05F 3/265 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 4416711 C1 19950803; EP 0682305 A1 19951115; EP 0682305 B1 20000802; US 5663674 A 19970902

INPADOC legal status

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150508

2015-06-03 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20150508

2015-05-10 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59508604

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140509

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140507

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140507

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-11-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20131017 AND 20131023

2013-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INTEL MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59508604

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130326

2013-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INTEL MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59508604

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130315

2013-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INTEL MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59508604

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130315

2013-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INTEL MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59508604

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130314

2013-01-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20121213 AND 20121219

2012-05-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: INTEL MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20120404

2011-12-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INTEL MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59508604

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111107

2011-12-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INTEL MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59508604

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111107

2011-10-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20110922

2011-08-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110707 AND 20110713

2005-05-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050509

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-10-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-10-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508604

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-07

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1996-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19960403

1996-03-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960119

1995-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT