Global Patent Index - EP 0682335 B1

EP 0682335 B1 2001-12-12 - Lamellated absorber

Title (en)

Lamellated absorber

Title (de)

Lamellenabsorber

Title (fr)

Dispositif absorbeur lamellé

Publication

EP 0682335 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95106848 A

Priority

DE 4416361 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0682335A2] The device comprises several vibration bodies formed as lamellas (4) arranged parallel and next to one another. The lamellas are elongated and their length is greater than or at least equal to their width. They are of one-piece construction so that a one-piece arrangement is formed with a number of individual vibrating lamellas. The lamellas are arranged in a housing (2) and between the upper and/or under side of the housing and the lamellas a lighter free space is provided, within which a vibratory movement of the lamellas is carried out.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10K 11/172

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/172 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/172 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Noise and vibration:",1982,S.483,John Wiley & Sons

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0682335 A2 19951115; EP 0682335 A3 19980107; EP 0682335 B1 20011212; DE 4416361 A1 19951116; ES 2169738 T3 20020716; MX 9501846 A 19970228; US 5719359 A 19980217

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-12-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031202

2003-02-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2002-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020505

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169738 T3

2002-05-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020527

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-05-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020506

2002-05-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020505

2002-04-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509926 20020124

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000914

1998-08-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980630

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

1995-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB