Global Patent Index - EP 0682352 B1

EP 0682352 B1 2002-09-11 - Energy regulator

Title (en)

Energy regulator

Title (de)

Energieregler

Title (fr)

Régulateur d'énergie

Publication

EP 0682352 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95303111 A

Priority

GB 9409489 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0682352A2] An energy regulator 1 has a bimetal element 5 as primary limb with a compensator limb 13. The primary limb is responsive to the heater 11 and the compensator limb compensates for ambient temperature fluctuation. The primary and compensator limbs are formed by splitting a single bimetal strip part-way along its length. The bimetal structure may be mounted on a flexible pivot 17. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 37/10; H01H 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 37/10 (2006.01); H01H 89/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 37/10 (2013.01); H01H 89/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0682352 A2 19951115; EP 0682352 A3 19961227; EP 0682352 B1 20020911; DE 69528106 D1 20021017; DE 69528106 T2 20030605; EP 1143470 A1 20011010; GB 9409489 D0 19940629

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150508

2015-06-03 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150508

2015-05-10 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69528106

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140724

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140530

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140530

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20121207

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110509

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-06-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69528106 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020911

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990302

1997-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970625

1996-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1995-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT